CO HB1253 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-04-14 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2014 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Recommendations Civil Commitment Review Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recommendations Civil Commitment Review Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-25 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2014 - No Amendments
2014-03-24HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2014 - No Amendments
2014-02-25HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DED9821E16FA74787257C300005FA8F?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DED9821E16FA74787257C300005FA8F/$FILE/1253_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DED9821E16FA74787257C300005FA8F/$FILE/1253hie_01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/58A5F7F79C5E68DE87257C8A0069E23D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DA6B95ABA40C1B3C87257C8A0069AA60
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1AC05305F1CA13E487257C8A006993F8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DA6B95ABA40C1B3C87257C8A0069AA60
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/58A5F7F79C5E68DE87257C8A0069E23D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1AC05305F1CA13E487257C8A006993F8

Bill Comments

feedback