CO HB1068 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Nonprofit Cemetery Corporation Board Directors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonprofit Cemetery Corporation Board Directors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment on page 2, lines 9 through 15, to allow for electronic transmission of documents when available (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment on page 2, lines 1 through 2, to insert "(f) A copy of the corporation's current balance sheet, income statement, and cash-flow statement." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.013 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.014 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment on page 2, lines 9 through 15, to allow for electronic transmission of documents when available (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment on page 2, lines 1 through 2, to insert "(f) A copy of the corporation's current balance sheet, income statement, and cash-flow statement." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.013 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.014 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - FINAL VOTE - L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - FINAL VOTE - L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-18 - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 14, after "MAKE" insert "BYLAWS," (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-18 - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 2, line 14, after "MAKE" insert: "BYLAWS," (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-29 Governor Action - Signed
2012-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2012-05-03 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2012-05-01 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-05-01 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily
2012-04-30 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-04-24 Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-04-10 Senate Committee on Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2012-03-30 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2012-03-27 House Third Reading Passed
2012-03-26 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-23 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-13 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-09 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-02-27 House Third Reading Referred w/Amend. to Appropriations
2012-02-14 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-02-13 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-02-13 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-02-07 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-02-01 House Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments
2012-01-24 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-01-18 House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-01-11 Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068app2nd.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_en2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068sloc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D577334C26DF2A6487257981007F4489/$FILE/1068_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/71D07CF968609C9E87257989006002FE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/54A01589203D3F9E8725798900601B2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/71D07CF968609C9E87257989006002FE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/54A01589203D3F9E8725798900601B2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F5802FC038341D05872579BC005073A6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3487F4777249DB3B872579BC0050C824
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CC203EEAAE25C02B872579EA007026C8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8EAD72CF517E9944872579EA006FF1D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5514DB64AB1BE59E872579EA00703DCA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/53BEA68E1D173339872579EA00702BF2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0CBA32F3CFD66A5E872579EA00705404
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F5802FC038341D05872579BC005073A6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3487F4777249DB3B872579BC0050C824
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CC203EEAAE25C02B872579EA007026C8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8EAD72CF517E9944872579EA006FF1D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5514DB64AB1BE59E872579EA00703DCA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/53BEA68E1D173339872579EA00702BF2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0CBA32F3CFD66A5E872579EA00705404

Bill Comments

feedback