CO HB1041 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Procedures For Transmission Of Records Under CORA

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedures For Transmission Of Records Under CORA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1014 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Attachment A) as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved an amendment to Amendment L. 006, Page 1, line 9, after "OTHER" insert "NOMINAL" The motion failed on a vote of 2-3. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Attachment B), that amends Amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1014 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Attachment A) as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved an amendment to Amendment L. 006, Page 1, line 9, after "OTHER" insert "NOMINAL" The motion failed on a vote of 2-3. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Attachment B), that amends Amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-08HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-05HouseSent to the Governor
2013-02-28HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-02-28HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-02-19SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2013-02-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-01-30HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041lg_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041sloc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4B0AE8B542D0C4F387257AEE005849E0/$FILE/1041_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/23B858CEAF358E5787257B03007A5C42
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/96AD69E1E909083A87257B03007A14A2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CDEA5D1C6A07E57A87257B170080E615
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AEBB5D2E0BD2B43887257B170081DDE3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/61D28F4C3CBB721587257B170080D656
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0B0E29DA7AFFB88E87257B1700821168
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/96AD69E1E909083A87257B03007A14A2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/23B858CEAF358E5787257B03007A5C42
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CDEA5D1C6A07E57A87257B170080E615
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AEBB5D2E0BD2B43887257B170081DDE3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/61D28F4C3CBB721587257B170080D656
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0B0E29DA7AFFB88E87257B1700821168

Bill Comments

feedback