CO HB1011 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Industry Economic Development Funding
Title
Advanced Industry Economic Development Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1011 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-17 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Referred w/Amend. to Appropriations - Committee |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-28 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |