CA SJR27 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-10)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-10)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to railroad safety.
Title
Railroad safety: transportation of crude oil.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR27 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - SJR 27 Padilla Senate Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR27 Padilla (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - SJR 27 Padilla Senate Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR27 Padilla (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-13 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4398.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5813.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3927.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |