CA SJR1 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 20 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-15 - Unfinished Business SJR1 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - SJR1 Wolk Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate 3rd Reading SJR1 Wolk (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-20SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-20SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2013-08-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1852.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-08-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-08-08AssemblyRead. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2013-04-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2013-03-07SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-02-26SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 221.) (February 26).
2013-02-15SenateSet for hearing February 26.
2013-01-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 28.)

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sjr_1&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_bill_20130118_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_bill_20130118_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_bill_20130808_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_bill_20130816_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_bill_20130820_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_vote_20130226_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_vote_20130307_1028AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_vote_20130618_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_vote_20130808_1018AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sjr_1_vote_20130815_1146AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback