CA SCR75 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to chronic obstructive pulmonary disease awareness.
Title
Chronic obstructive pulmonary disease awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SCR 75 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Special Consent Cal SCR75 Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Special Consent Cal SCR75 Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2656.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |