CA SCR73 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21)
Status: Passed on January 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21)
Status: Passed on January 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Title
Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR73 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR73 Mitchell (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR73 Mitchell (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2637.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3635.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 17). |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 2611.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |