CA SCR72 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the David M. Gonzales Medal of Honor World War II Memorial Interchange.
Title
David M. Gonzales Medal of Honor World War II Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SCR 72 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 1st SCR72 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-05 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 1st SCR72 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-05 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-05 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6716.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4468.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Set for hearing August 11. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4336.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Set for hearing August 5. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |