CA SCR135 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Massage Therapy Awareness Week in California.
Title
National Massage Therapy Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 4 SCR135 Evans Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SCR 135 Evans Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Evans (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SCR 135 Evans Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Evans (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-05 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4992.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6716.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4363.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |