CA SCR121 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-20)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-20)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the memorandum of understanding between Israel and California.
Title
Trade: Israel: memorandum of understanding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR121 Block Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR121 Block (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR121 Block (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-13 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4398.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5814.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected July 28.) |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3782.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected June 11.) |