CA SCR120 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-20)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-20)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Year of the Community.
Title
Year of the Community: developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR120 De Le (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR120 De Le (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR120 De Le (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3926.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5495.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3593.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |