CA SCR115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Senator Jenny Oropeza Memorial Freeway.
Title
Senator Jenny Oropeza Memorial Freeway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SCR 115 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR115 Lara (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR115 Lara (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Set for hearing June 23. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3846.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |