CA SCA5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 31 of Article I thereof, relating to public education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public education: student recruitment and selection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SCA5 Hernandez (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-17SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2014-03-17AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2014-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-01-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-01-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-01-23SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2646.) (January 23).
2014-01-22SenateSet for hearing January 23.
2014-01-21SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2013-08-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-20SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1932.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-08-08SenateSet for hearing August 20.
2013-07-03SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 1662.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2013-06-25SenateSet for hearing July 3.
2013-06-24SenateHearing postponed by committee.
2013-05-30SenateHearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-24SenateSet for hearing June 5.
2013-04-25SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-12SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2013-02-07SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
2012-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2012-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_5&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_bill_20130530_amended_sen_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_bill_20130530_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_bill_20130530_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_vote_20130703_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_vote_20130820_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_vote_20140121_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_vote_20140123_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_5_vote_20140130_1118AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback