CA SB990 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 3312.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 3312.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14527 of the Government Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Transportation funds: disadvantaged small communities.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 3312.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14527 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99233.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |