CA SB989 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 722 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veteran services: state agencies and departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3095.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 722 | New Code | See Bill Text |