CA SB968 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 922, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 922, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6213.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public lands.
Title
Public lands: Martins Beach property: access road.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB968 Hill Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 968 Hill Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB968 Hill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 968 Hill Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB968 Hill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 922, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 25. Page 6251.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 3657.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3235.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3092.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6213.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |