CA SB965 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11125.7 of the Government Code and to amend Section 13228.14 of, to add Section 13167.6 to, and to add Chapter 4.1 (commencing with Section 13287) to Division 7 of, the Water Code, relating to state and local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-31 - SB 965 Wright Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Unfinished Supp 2 SB965 Wright Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate 3rd Reading SB965 Wright (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2012-08-31 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5096.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 7. Page 6727.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-30 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-29 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-28 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 28).
2012-08-27 Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
2012-08-24 Read third time and amended. (Page 6250.) Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-13 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-09 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2012-06-28 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-21 Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2012-06-19 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-14 Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and G.O.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-29 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3640.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-22 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-21 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2012-05-11 Set for hearing May 21.
2012-05-02 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-05-01 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3261.) (April 23).
2012-04-05 Set for hearing April 23.
2012-03-28 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2012-03-08 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2012-02-02 Referred to Com. on E.Q.
2012-01-12 From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2012-01-11 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11125.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13167.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13169.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13228.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13263Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13269Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13293New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13377Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_965&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120111_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120308_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120328_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120502_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120621_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120824_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120829_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_bill_20120925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120423_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120529_1254PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120619_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120628_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120808_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120828_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120831_1006PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_965_vote_20120831_1048AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback