CA SB96 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1352 of, to add Section 2850.5 to, and to repeal Section 712.5 of, the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 927.9, 11549.3, and 51018 of, and to add Section 1304 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 44299.91 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 12211 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4785, 5018.1, 5080.18, 5096.650, 14538, 14539, 14549.5, 14553, 14572, 14591, 25751, 26052, 26055, 26060, 26062, 26063, 35600, 35605, 35625, 42977, 48704, 71300, 71301, 71302, 71303, 71304, and 71305 of, to add Sections 25711.5 and 25711.7 to, and to repeal Sections 4124 and 4515 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 309.5, 2851, and 5900 of, and to add Sections 318, 740.5, 854.5, and 2120 to, the Public Utilities Code, to add Section 104.22 to the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Section 85200 of, and to add Section 10001.7 to, the Water Code, and to repeal Section 34 of Chapter 718 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Budget Act of 2013: public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB96 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 96 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB96 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 96 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB96 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2278.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2965.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 29). |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 898.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |