CA SB95 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2013 (Chapter 20 of the Statutes of 2013) by amending Items 0540-001-0140, 0540-001-0183, 0650-001-0001, 0890-001-0228, 2660-001-0042, 2660-101-0890, 2660-102-0042, 2660-102-0890, 2660-301-0890, 2660-491, 2660-495, 3790-001-0392, 3790-101-0858, 3900-001-0044, 3900-001-3119, 3930-001-0106, 5225-006-0001, 5225-007-0001, 6110-161-0890, 6110-194-0001, 6110-295-0001, 6870-001-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-139-8080, 6870-295-0001, 6980-101-0001, and 8955-101-0001 of, by adding Items 0540-101-0183, 2660-022-0042, 2660-108-0042, 2660-108-0890, 2660-308-0042, 2660-308-0890, 3360-402, 3360-403, 3900-011-3117, 6110-404, 6870-001-6049, 6870-491, and 8855-490 to, and by repealing Items 2660-001-0045, 2660-101-0045, and 2660-101-0183 of, Section 2.00 of, and by amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the State Budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, Budget Bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 95 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB95 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB95 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB95 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB95 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2351.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 25. Page 3173.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2941.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 29). |
2013-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 898.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |