CA SB949 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 23.5 (commencing with Section 8490) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs.
Title
After school programs: Distinguished After School Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB949 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 949 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 949 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB949 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 949 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 949 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB949 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 6410.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6227.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (June 24). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3604.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3705.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3338.) (April 30). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Corrected April 11.) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8490 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104670 | New Code | See Bill Text |