CA SB946 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4730.65 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to community facilities.
Title
Community facilities: Orange County Sanitation District.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 SB946 Huff (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - SB 946 Huff Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Special Consent #12 SB946 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - SB 946 Huff Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Special Consent #12 SB946 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4254.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5618.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3119.) (April 9). |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 4730.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |