CA SB941 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 433, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 433, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 678) to Chapter 5 of Division 3 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to vessels.
Title
Vessel operator cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB941 Monning Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 941 Monning Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB941 Monning (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 941 Monning Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB941 Monning (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 433, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 4686.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6236.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 16). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 3657.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3705.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3092.) (April 8). |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 678 | New Code | See Bill Text |