CA SB94 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1661, 4000, 4601, 5902.5, and 9554 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Vehicle License Fee Law: vehicle registration.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - #76 SB94 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Assembly - SB 94 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB94 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Assembly - SB 94 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB94 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-05-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 807.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 806.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-04-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 780.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2011-04-28 | Assembly Rule 96(b) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 24. Page 1119.) Withdrawn from committee. Consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 1126.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-02-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-02-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 170.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5902.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9554 | Amended Code | Citation Text |