CA SB918 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14104.1 and 14106 to the Government Code, to amend Section 10120 of the Public Contract Code, and to add Section 172 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14104.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 172 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |