CA SB916 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32025, 32030, and 32110 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3310.) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Corrected March 21.) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25250.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 12405 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 32025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42359 | New Code | See Bill Text |