CA SB915 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 99160.5 to the Education Code, relating to standardized testing.
Title
Standardized testing: inadequate or improper test conditions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB915 Hill Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 915 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB915 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 915 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB915 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4400.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5906.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5747.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3328.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3254.) (April 24). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 99160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 99160.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |