CA SB873 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 155) to Title 1 of Part 1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to add Section 757 to the Evidence Code, to amend Sections 1546.1, 1546.2, 1569.481, 1569.482, and 1569.682 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 11461.3, 11462.04, 11477, and 12300.4 of, and to add Chapter 5.6 (commencing with Section 13300) to Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 88 of Chapter 29 of the Statutes of 2014, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 3 SB873 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 873 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 873 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules By CHAVEZ (Y: 23 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 873 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB873 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 873 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 873 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules By CHAVEZ (Y: 23 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 873 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB873 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4985.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6711.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 9.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6331.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 25. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3136.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 155 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Evidence Code | 757 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1546.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1546.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.481 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11461.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11462.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11477 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12300.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13300 | New Code | See Bill Text |