CA SB823 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5092, 5093, 5094.3, and 8030.5 of, to add Section 5092.1 to, and to add and repeal Sections 8030.4, 8030.6, and 8030.8 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Professions and vocations: licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 823 B. P.& E.D. Third Reading Urgency By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB823 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Lieu) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB823 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Price) Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB823 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Lieu) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB823 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Price) Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2383.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3175.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2948.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 806.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5092 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5092.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5094.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8030.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8030.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8030.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8030.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |