CA SB722 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1341 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Mexican American Veterans' Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #15 SB722 Correa (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - SB 722 Correa Third Reading Urgency By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB722 Correa Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - SB 722 Correa Third Reading Urgency By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB722 Correa Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3536.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5023.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 21). |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2592.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and G.O. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999 | Amended Code | Citation Text |