CA SB706 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act to add Section 3470 to the Penal Code, relating to county prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County prisoners: Community Reintegration and

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-30 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2013-04-30SenateSet, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 757.)
2013-04-25SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-23SenateSet, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2013-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3470New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback