CA SB69 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-04-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 97.70 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government finance: property tax revenue allocation: vehicle license fee adjustments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SB69 Liu (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-09-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-09-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1199.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
2013-05-21SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2013-05-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 785.) (May 1).
2013-04-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 1 in ED. pending receipt.
2013-04-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 9).
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code14002New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code14002.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code14002.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code14003New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code14501New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code1622New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code33127New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code41020New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code41202New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code42127New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code42238Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.11Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.12Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.13Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.14Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.145Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.146Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.17Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.18Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.41Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.42Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.43Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.44Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.445Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.45Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.46Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.48Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.485Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.49Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.51Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.52Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.53Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.75Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.95Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42239Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42240.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42241.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42241.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code42243.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code46201.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47604.33New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47610New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47630.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code47631New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47632New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47633Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code47634.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49085Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52052Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code97.70Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_69&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130110_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130425_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130508_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20091102_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130110_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130425_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130508_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20130912_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_bill_20140421_amended_asm_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_vote_20130501_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_vote_20130520_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_69_vote_20130530_1227PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback