CA SB644 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Section 29800 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: felons in possession: serious felonies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2013-05-23SenateHeld in committee and under submission.
2013-05-21SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 30).
2013-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1170.125Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1192.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29800Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code530.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_644&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130513_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20130513_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20130430_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20130520_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback