CA SB599 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 535 and 535.5 of, and to add Sections 530.5, 541.7, and 541.8 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State parks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-02 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Be referred to Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate 3rd Reading SB599 Evans (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-30AssemblySet, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2013-08-14AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2013-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
2013-06-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-05-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 806.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-04-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 719.) (April 29).
2013-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2013-04-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_599&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130410_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130612_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130703_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130410_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130612_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_bill_20130703_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_vote_20130416_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_vote_20130429_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_vote_20130506_0113PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_vote_20130617_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_599_vote_20130702_000001_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback