CA SB54 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003.5 of, and to add Section 3003.51 to, the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Sex offenders: residency restriction: petition for relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | June 30 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 1706.) Reconsideration granted. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 30. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3003.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3003.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |