CA SB530 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 432.7 of the Labor Code, and to add Section 4852.22 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal offenders.
Title
Criminal offenders: rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB530 Wright Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Assembly - SB 530 Wright Senate Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB530 Wright (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Assembly - SB 530 Wright Senate Third Reading By BRADFORD (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB530 Wright (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2863.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2793.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1175.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1016.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 8712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 8908 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 432.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4852.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |