CA SB53 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 17315, 30000, 30005, 30312, 30345, 30347, 30350, 30352, and 30365 of, to amend the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 30345) of Chapter 1 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, to add Sections 16663, 30313, 30348, and 30367 to, to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 30380) to Chapter 1 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, and to repeal Section 30355 of, the Penal Code, relating to ammunition.
Title
Ammunition: purchase permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Assembly - SB 53 De Leon Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 35 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 53 De Leon Senate Third Reading By BONTA Amend By BONTA Set #1 (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB53 De Le (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 53 De Leon Senate Third Reading By BONTA Amend By BONTA Set #1 (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB53 De Le (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 35. Page 6766.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 6328.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 10). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3190.) Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2951.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 20. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16663 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 17315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30313 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30345 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30347 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30348 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30355 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30367 | New Code | See Bill Text |