CA SB51 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 19990.01) to Division 8 of, and to repeal Sections 19990.23.5 and 19990.96 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to Internet gambling, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet gambling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2013-09-12SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 2413.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2013-01-07SenateRead first time.
2012-12-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
2012-12-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19990.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.23.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19990.96Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback