CA SB49 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10705 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: special elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - SB 49 Runner Third Reading Urgency By WILK (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 Runner Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 Runner Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-07-25 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-07-25 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 5514.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1873.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Set for hearing July 6. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1451.) (June 16). |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Set for hearing June 16. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 10705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |