CA SB477 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 711, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 711, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9998.1, 9998.6, and 9998.8 of, to add Sections 9998.1.5, 9998.2.5, 9998.10, and 9998.11 to, and to repeal and add Section 9998.2 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to foreign labor contractors.
Title
Foreign labor contractors: registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB477 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 477 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB477 Steinberg By De Leon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 477 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB477 Steinberg By De Leon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 711, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4914.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 6409.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2644.) (January 23). |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9998.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9998.1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9998.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9998.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9998.2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9998.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9998.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |