CA SB473 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 186.22 of the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB473 Block Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 473 Block Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB473 Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 473 Block Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB473 Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4469.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5968.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5911.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel PĂ©rez. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 186.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 266 | New Code | See Bill Text |