CA SB468 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4685.8 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: statewide Self-Determination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 468 Emmerson Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB468 Emmerson Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB468 Emmerson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB468 Emmerson Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB468 Emmerson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3171.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2946.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1203.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 661.) (April 23). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4685.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |