CA SB458 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 580e of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to mortgages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Mortgages: deficiency judgments.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Juan Vargas [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - Assembly - SB 458 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB458 Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB458 Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-07-01 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12). | |
2011-04-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-31 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-29 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-03-22 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-18 | Set for hearing March 29. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 580 | Amended Code | Citation Text |