CA SB448 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 101.5 to the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB448 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Assembly - SB 448 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB448 DeSaulnier (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Assembly - SB 448 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB448 DeSaulnier (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained. | |
2011-09-06 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-09-06 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-08-18 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1974.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-15 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-15 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2388.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2330.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 853.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-05 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |