CA SB409 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 34171, 34178, and 34191.4 of, and to add Section 34004.2 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to disaster recovery project areas.
Title
Disaster recovery project areas: enforceable obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34004.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34178 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34191.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |