CA SB407 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3511.1 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: officers and employees: contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-22 - SB 407 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB407 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2013-08-22SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2013-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2013-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1103.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1013.) (May 23).
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-04-15SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2013-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3511.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code3511.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53243Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53243.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_407&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_bill_20130823_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_bill_20130906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130403_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130415_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130528_0337PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130626_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130814_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_407_vote_20130822_1019AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback