CA SB396 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Sections 48215 and 66010.8 of the Education Code, to repeal Section 53069.65 of the Government Code, to repeal Chapter 1.3 (commencing with Section 130) of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code, to repeal Section 834b of the Penal Code, and to repeal Section 10001.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public services.
Title
Public services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB396 De Le (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 396 De Leon Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 396 Hancock Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB396 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 396 De Leon Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 396 Hancock Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB396 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4719.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4671.) |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Set for hearing August 20. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4543.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 1. Page 6028.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5424.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 3311.) Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Rendon. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 34. Page 3250.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Rendon. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2953.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1150.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1013.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48215 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66010.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53069.65 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 834 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10001.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |