CA SB384 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 70010.5 and 70011 of the Education Code, relating to scholarships, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Memorial Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB384 Gaines Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 384 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB384 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 384 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB384 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5918.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2139.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2051.) (August 30). |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Set for hearing August 30. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1246.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing June 5. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70010.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |