CA SB372 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State property: surplus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_372&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_372_bill_20130220_introduced.html |