CA SB363 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25100, 25200, 32000, and 32015 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: criminal storage: unsafe handguns: fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-04 - Unfinished Business SB363 Wright Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - SB 363 Wright Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate 3rd Reading SB363 Wright (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2013-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2134.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 2830.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 2793.) Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-16SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 945.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
2013-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2013-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-23SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-16SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code25100Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code25200Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code25240New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code32000Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code32015Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_363&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130402_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130422_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130611_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130402_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130422_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130611_amended_asm_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130805_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130830_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20130906_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_bill_20131011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130430_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130513_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130516_1019AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130618_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130703_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130903_1244PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_363_vote_20130904_0232PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback